Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Health Education Program – Female Monthly Cycle Tracking for Adolescent Girls
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Emphasizing the General Assembly's support, and urging the support, of female monthly cycle tracking education for adolescent girls; and encouraging the State Board of Education to update the comprehensive health education program to include certain standards for instruction on female monthly cycle tracking for adolescent girls.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Comprehensive Health Education Program – Female Monthly Cycle Tracking for Adolescent Girls
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:31 PM
Click to return on the top page