Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a nurse anesthetist to prescribe, order, and administer drugs, including controlled dangerous substances, subject to certain limitations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Senate Rules 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2022 3/20/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page