Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, to operate up to 300 electronic instant bingo machines more than the number of machines the entity operated on February 28, 2008; and requiring the entity to make a $1,000 investment in the facility where the machine is located for each additional machine put into operation for the first time after July 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Gaming - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Expansion
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page