Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop and implement a public awareness campaign to encourage the use of mental health advance directives in the State; and requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to study the feasibility and cost of establishing a centralized statewide database of mental health advance directives and report the findings of the study to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1467
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {633125/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page