Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include Delmarva Community Services, Inc. and the Maryland Association of Counties Pooled OPEB Trust Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1474
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2022 2/20/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Definition of Local Government
Senate 3/29/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2022 11:12 AM
Click to return on the top page