Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain limitations on certain retailers relating to the sale of electronic smoking devices; prohibiting the advertisement or promotion of electronic smoking devices in certain outdoor locations and in publications where 15% of the readership is under 21 years of age; prohibiting the marketing of electronic smoking devices to individuals under the age of 21 in a certain manner; prohibiting a person from manufacturing, distributing, selling, bartering, or furnishing certain electronic smoking devices in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2022 2/20/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   16.7-101,   16.7-301 through 16.7-304 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page