Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Definition and Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county or municipal corporation to define, by law, who is a law enforcement office or rescue worker for purposes of certain property tax credits; altering the eligibility for the tax credit to include certain disabled law enforcement officers or rescue workers who were domiciled in the State within 5 years prior to the death of the officer or worker or the determination of the officer's or worker's permanent and total disability; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Police and Criminal Investigators
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593627/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Definition and Eligibility
Senate 3/29/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {933122/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page