Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Klausmeier, Jennings, West, Lam, Hettleman, Sydnor, and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from including the dredging of buried oyster shells on Man-O-War Shoals as part of a fishery management plan; and prohibiting the Department from dredging buried oyster shells on Man-O-War Shoals.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0437 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prohibition of Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/21/2022 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page