Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing obsolete and redundant language in, clarifying language in, and reorganizing certain provisions of law governing the State Board of Physicians and the regulation of physicians, physician assistants, and allied health professionals; authorizing the Board to regulate the allied health committees; and repealing the requirement that the Board provide a certain data sheet.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-404.2,   12-102,   1-302,   1-306,   14-101,   14-102,   14-205,   14-206,   14-206.1,   14-207,   14-301,   14-302,   14-303, 14-304, 14-305, 14-306,   14-307,   14-308,   14-308.1,   14-309,   14-311,   14-312,   14-313,   14-313.1,   14-314,   14-315,   14-316,   14-317,   14-318 through 14-320,   14-322,   14-3A-01,   14-401.1,   14-401.2, 14-402,   14-404,   14-405,   14-406,   14-409,   14-411,   14-411.1,   14-413,   14-413 through 14-415,   14-416,   14-417, 14-502,   14-503,   14-504,   14-505,   14-506,   14-507,   14-508,   14-509,   14-510, 14-511, 14-513, 14-514, 14-515, 14-516, 14-517, 14-518, 14-521, 14-524, 14-525, 14-527, 14-528, 14-5A-01,   14-5A-02 through 14-5A-04,   14-5A-05,   14-5A-06,   14-5A-09,   14-5A-10,   14-5A-11,   14-5A-13,   14-5A-14,   14-5A-16,   14-5A-17,   14-5A-17.1,   14-5A-18.1,   14-5A-19,   14-5B-02 through 14-5B-04,   14-5B-05,   14-5B-07,   14-5B-09,   14-5B-10,   14-5B-11,   14-5B-12,   14-5B-12.1,   14-5B-13,   14-5B-14,   14-5B-14.1,   14-5B-15.1,   14-5B-16,   14-5C-01,   14-5C-02 through 14-5C-04,   14-5C-05,   14-5C-06,   14-5C-08,   14-5C-09,   14-5C-10,   14-5C-11,   14-5C-12,   14-5C-14,   14-5C-14.1,   14-5C-16,   14-5C-17,   14-5C-18.1,   14-5C-19,   14-5D-02,   14-5D-03,   14-5D-05,   14-5D-07,   14-5D-08,   14-5D-09,   14-5D-10,   14-5D-12,   14-5D-12.1,   14-5D-13,   14-5D-14,   14-5D-15,   14-5D-16,   14-5D-16.1,   14-5E-01,   14-5E-02 through 14-5E-04,   14-5E-06,   14-5E-08,   14-5E-09,   14-5E-10,   14-5E-11,   14-5E-13,   14-5E-14,   14-5E-15,   14-5E-16,   14-5E-17,   14-5E-18.1,   14-5E-19,   14-5F-04,   14-5F-05,   14-5F-07,   14-5F-11,   14-5F-12,   14-5F-13,   14-5F-15,   14-5F-15.1,   14-5F-16,   14-5F-17,   14-5F-18,   14-5F-21,   14-5F-23,   14-5F-24,   14-5G-02 through 14-5G-04,   14-5G-09,   14-5G-10,   14-5G-11,   14-5G-13,   14-5G-14,   14-5G-15,   14-5G-16,   14-5G-17,   14-5G-18,   14-5G-19,   14-5G-21,   14-5G-22,   14-5H-01, 14-5H-02, 14-5H-03, 14-5H-06, 14-5H-07, 14-5H-08, 14-5H-09, 14-5H-10, 14-5H-12, 14-5H-14, 14-5H-15, 14-5H-16, 14-5H-21 through 14-5H-23, 14-601,   14-602,   14-603,   14-605,   14-607,   15-101 through 15-103,   15-201,   15-202,   15-203,   15-204,   15-205,   15-206,   15-301,   15-302,   15-302.1 through 15-302.3,   15-303,   15-304,   15-305,   15-306,   15-307,   15-308,   15-309,   15-310 through 15-312,   15-313,   15-314,   15-315 through 15-316.1,   15-317,   15-401,   15-402,   15-402.1,   15-403,   15-501,   15-502,   8-205   )
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page