Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring energy efficiency and conservation programs and services provided by gas companies and electric companies to encourage and promote the electrification of certain products and beneficial electrification beginning with calendar year 2024; prohibiting the energy efficiency and conservation programs and services from providing financial assistance for equipment or appliances that use fossil fuel; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Alterations
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page