Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Department of Education to make a procurement on an expedited basis with the approval of the State Board of Education; authorizing virtual schools to operate on a year-round basis; requiring the Department, in accordance with the expedited procurement process, to issue a request for proposals for a statewide platform to provide virtual education on or before May 1, 2021; requiring the Department to award a contract for the virtual education platform on or before June 1, 2021; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2021
Legislative Date
2/21/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2021 2/21/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Virtual Schools – Statewide Education Platform – Procurement and Establishment
Senate 3/09/2021 3/10/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page