Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Projects – Global Warming Potential of Materials (Buy Clean Maryland Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish a maximum acceptable global warming potential for certain categories of eligible materials used in certain eligible projects; requiring a unit of State government to specify the eligible materials that will be used in an eligible project in the solicitation for an eligible project; requiring a successful bidder or offeror of an eligible project to submit certain information about each eligible material proposed to be used in an eligible project; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Projects – Global Warming Potential of Materials (Buy Clean Maryland Act)
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
(   4-901 through 4-905 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page