Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Transportation from acquiring a right-of-way or exercising eminent domain, and prohibiting a person from acquiring a right-of-way, for a highway project that encroaches on or adversely affects certain cultural and historic sites and properties unless the General Assembly approves the development of the project by a majority vote in each of the two Houses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1373
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2021
Legislative Date
2/21/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2021 2/21/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 12:42 PM
Click to return on the top page