Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that professional personnel and staff employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional and skilled services of the State Personnel Management System; requiring that the Secretary of Budget and Management assign the professional personnel and staff to the professional and skilled services of the State Personnel Management System, and to certain bargaining units; and requiring that the professional personnel and staff of the school suffer no diminution of pay or benefits.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2022 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page