Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act to include Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc., in Dorchester County; providing that a certain notice requirement does not apply to certain actions against Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc., in Dorchester County or its employees; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Senate 3/09/2021 3/10/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page