Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioids - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund and Overdose Response Program
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to direct that an Opioid Restitution Fund Advisory Council committee be formed if required by a court or administrative order or settlement agreement entered into by the Attorney General; applying the requirement that the appropriation and distribution of funds in the Opioid Restitution Fund that were received in accordance with certain agreements be made in a certain manner to funds received in accordance with any opioid-related court or administrative judgment or settlement agreement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
4/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Overdose Response Program – Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs – Choice of Formulation and Dosage
Senate 3/08/2023 3/09/2023 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2023 4/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2023 3/23/2023 Favorable with Amendments {913721/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2023 3/23/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Opioids - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund and Overdose Response Program
Senate 4/06/2023 3/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2023 3/26/2023 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page