Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Bills for Electricity Service – Meter Reading
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, by regulation or order, to require that a customer's bill for electricity service include the customer's exact meter readings for the close of the last billing cycle and the close of the current billing cycle.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities – Bills for Electricity Service – Meter Reading
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2021 2/17/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Utilities – Bills for Electricity Service – Meter Reading
Senate 3/23/2021 3/24/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page