Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs)
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Outreach and Advocacy Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs to be the Office of Communications and Public Affairs; requiring the Office, in collaboration with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to actively help veterans and their dependents become aware of and access certain benefits; altering certain responsibilities of the director of the Office; repealing a certain requirement that the Department develop and maintain a certain database of veterans in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1358
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Senate 3/09/2021 3/10/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 4:50 PM
Click to return on the top page