Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability – Applicability
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Clarifying that a certain provision of law governing a general contractor's liability for unpaid wages owed to employees of a subcontractor applies only to general contractors on a project for construction services under a contract entered into after September 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability – Applicability
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page