Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Calvert County Board of Education to provide an opportunity for the public to comment on certain matters at each public meeting; requiring a member of the public who wishes to provide comments to be given 3 uninterrupted minutes to provide the comments, if the president of the county board recognizes the individual to speak; authorizing a member of the public to submit written comments; and requiring the county board to include certain written comments in the minutes for the meeting in which the comments were submitted.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1357
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2021 2/14/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page