Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith and Hayes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and community gardens and improve access to urban-grown foods; and establishing the Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Fund to provide grants to urban agricultural producers and qualified nonprofit organizations for the purchase and installation of agriculture equipment associated with water supply and irrigation and electric power access.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0855
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-4)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {853727/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-4) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Water and Power Infrastructure Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
(   2-2101 through 2-2104 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page