Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Subjecting the adoption of a certain fire prevention code to authorizations granted to a county or municipal corporation for the installation of solar energy generating systems of any size on the rooftop of a single-family residential dwelling for which a permit is required; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to require the installation of a certain solar energy generating system to include a certain fire protection pathway, subject to certain exceptions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page