Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees’ Pension System – Purchase of Service
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain former members of the Employees' Pension System to purchase credit for eligibility service for certain employment with the State for which the former members are not entitled to credit; and providing for the manner in which to purchase the service credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employees’ Pension System – Purchase of Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Employees’ Pension System – Purchase of Service
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page