Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, and Registration
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain health occupations boards to issue a temporary expedited license, certificate, or registration to a service member, veteran, or military spouse who meets certain requirements; providing for the term of a certain temporary license, certificate, or registration; requiring that an application for a certain temporary license, certificate, or registration include certain information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1006
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, and Registration
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-701,   1-702.1, 1-702.2 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page