Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to take into consideration a family's student loan debt in developing eligibility requirements for certain financial assistance related to residential mortgages; clarifying that the Community Development Administration may purchase notes, mortgages, or partial interests in notes or mortgages that evidence certain new residential mortgage loans for the refinancing of existing residential mortgage loans; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page