Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Purple Star Schools Program to recognize public schools that provide strong services and supports for military-connected students and their families; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Program and designate a public school as a Purple Star School under certain circumstances; establishing the qualifications for the designation of a Purple Star School; authorizing a certain school to partner with a county board of education to fulfill certain program requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-126 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page