Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to submit a certain report that analyzes the banking environment in the State to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; and requiring the report to include the number and types of financial institutions by jurisdiction, identification of banking deserts, and recommended strategies for ensuring that residents of underserved areas have access to financial services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-14)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-14) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page