Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying standards for involuntary admission of individuals with mental disorders to a certain facility or Veterans' Administration hospital to include consideration that it can be reasonably expected, if not hospitalized, a certain individual presents a danger to the life or safety of the individual or to others; modifying certain standards or emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders; and requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to provide certain information to certain schools; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1344
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service
Senate 3/23/2021 3/24/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page