Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amount of total user fees, from up to $16,000,000 to up to the greater of 0.1% of the immediately preceding fiscal year's budgeted, regulated, gross hospital revenue or the largest amount determined for a fiscal year during the immediately preceding 5 fiscal years, that may be assessed on hospitals and related institutions by the Health Services Cost Review Commission.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0510
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713526/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-32)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713526/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-32) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page