Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
Sponsored by
Senator Hester (By Request - Joint Cybersecurity, Information Technology, and Biotechnology Committee)
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each unit of State government and certain local agencies to submit a certain report related to information technology and cybersecurity to the Department of Information Technology on or before September 1 each year; establishing the required contents of certain reports; and requiring the Department to compile and analyze certain information and report to each unit of State government and the General Assembly certain information and recommendations by December 31 each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:29 PM
Click to return on the top page