Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Board of Charles County Commissioners, the Charles County Board of Education, the Interagency Commission on School Construction, and the members of the Charles County Delegation of the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0739
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Appropriations 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text - Chapter - Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Charles County Public Schools
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/25/2022 8:43 AM
Click to return on the top page