Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain whistleblower reward program within the Office of the Comptroller; providing that a certain whistleblower who voluntarily provides certain information to the Comptroller shall be entitled to receive a certain monetary award under certain circumstances; providing for the determination and allocation of the amount of an award if two or more whistleblowers are eligible for the award; providing that the determination of the amount of the award shall be solely in the discretion of the Comptroller; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {209135/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-1103,   1-401 through 1-408 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page