Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalties for certain offenses of manslaughter and homicide by vehicle or vessel; and establishing that certain previous convictions for drunk and drugged operation of a vehicle or vessel and grossly negligent manslaughter by vehicle or vessel under certain provisions of law constitute prior convictions for the purpose of determining certain enhanced subsequent offender penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0967
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page