Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing restrictions on holding an election in a building used, owned, or occupied by an establishment that holds an alcoholic beverages license; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations regarding the use of a building or part of a building that is owned, occupied, or partially occupied by an establishment that holds an alcoholic beverages license as a polling place; and requiring certain regulations to prioritize the placement of polling places in a facility not owned by the holder of an alcoholic beverage license.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0328
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923924/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Ways and Means 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (124-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text - Chapter - Elections - Polling Place Location Restrictions - Repeal
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page