Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to conduct a certain study on designating certain periods each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of certain textbooks purchased by certain students; requiring the Comptroller, in conducting the study, to make a certain presumption; requiring the Comptroller to submit a report of its findings and any recommendations on or before December 31, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0792
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499330/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {499330/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Study on Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-241 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page