Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Cecil County to a list of counties to which certain riparian laws do not apply; prohibiting a person from placing pound nets to catch fish for commercial use in the waters of the Susquehanna River in Cecil County; and repealing certain fishing restrictions that apply in Cecil County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0644
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0799 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {853620/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {253228/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {853620/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Fishing - Revisions
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page