Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Title IX - Policies and Procedures (Hear Our Voices Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, by March 31, 2023, to develop policies and procedures for reporting, administering, investigating, and resolving complaints related to incidents of sexual misconduct and violations of Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972; and authorizing a person to bring a civil action against a local system that fails to comply with certain policies and procedures and to recover damages, reasonable costs, and attorney's fees.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Title IX - Policies and Procedures (Hear Our Voices Act of 2022)
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
(   7-450 )
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page