Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Testing at a Community–Based Health Fair
Sponsored by
Senator Watson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to authorize qualified persons to offer and perform testing for detecting sickle cell disease at a community-based health fair; and authorizing the person to provide information on and resources for living with sickle cell disease while performing testing at a community-based health fair.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1170
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Testing at a Community–Based Health Fair
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page