Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Personal Care Aides – Reimbursement and Required Wage
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to increase the reimbursement rate for Program long-term services and supports by 15% on or before July 1, 2023; requiring a provider agency to pay to certain personal care aides a wage rate of at least $16 per hour on or before July 1, 2023; requiring a provider agency to submit certain cost reports to the Maryland Department of Health; authorizing the Department to take certain enforcement actions; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0981
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Personal Care Aides – Reimbursement and Required Wage
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/9/2022 8:39 AM
Click to return on the top page