Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from personal property taxes; requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to assess certain land used by a community solar energy generating system in a certain manner; requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on real property on which a certain community solar energy generating system is installed; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax imposed on certain real property; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733424/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {413521/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-22)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-10)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {733424/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator West) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Floor Amendment {413521/1 (Senator West) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solar Energy - School Construction and Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803123/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (111-22) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-10) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page