Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Jackson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, to operate up a certain number of electronic instant bingo machines.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1316
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453921/1
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {763520/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-4)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453921/1 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453921/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {763520/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (39-4) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page