Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospital Flu Vaccines
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring hospitals to immunize patients against the influenza virus and pneumococcal disease except under certain circumstances; and providing for the manner of obtaining consent for and conducting the immunizations for a hospital patient.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospital Flu Vaccines
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospital Flu Vaccines
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page