Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsored by
Senator Carter (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain law enforcement agencies to access, under certain circumstances, social media accounts of applicants; and prohibiting certain law enforcement agencies from keeping or reserving an applicant's user name, password, or other means of accessing a personal account or service.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agency Exemption
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593328/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Judiciary 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/9/2022 10:55 AM
Click to return on the top page