Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Bailey, Eckardt, Guzzone, and Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing various programs, goals, research requirements, planning requirements, and funding requirements related to oyster spat, oyster shells, and oyster substrate; requiring the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation to provide loans up to $250,000 to finance the eligible costs of certain eligible seafood processing projects; replacing the oyster shell recycling tax credit with an annual grant program administered by the Department of Natural Resources; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {353522/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-85)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913029/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/30/2022 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {353522/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-85) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page