Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to include on the Maryland resident individual income tax return form a certain notification concerning the homeowners' property tax credit and a certain separate form that a taxpayer may use to apply for the homeowners' property tax credit; and requiring that certain qualifying homeowners receive the homeowners' property tax credit for subsequent taxable years without being required to file an application for the credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 12:23 PM
Click to return on the top page