Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing funding for, the award of, and the distribution of bonuses for child care providers and employees; and requiring, in fiscal year 2023, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $16,000,000 to the State Department of Education to carry out the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {233328/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Care Providers and Employees – Bonuses
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page