Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Membership and Coordinated Community Supports Partnership Fund - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Hester
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law regarding the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports, including membership, terms of members, appointment of the chair, staff, and memorandum of understanding for technical assistance; altering certain provisions of law regarding the administration of the Coordinated Community Supports Partnership Fund; and increasing the amount of certain appropriations in certain fiscal years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations Ways and Means
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-21)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Membership and Coordinated Community Supports Partnership Fund - Revisions
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723122/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Membership and Coordinated Community Supports Partnership Fund - Revisions
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Appropriations Ways and Means 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (112-21) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Text - Chapter - Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Membership and Coordinated Community Supports Partnership Fund - Revisions
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:33 PM
Click to return on the top page