Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibition on Sale of Wildlife - Local Venison Donation Programs - Application
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the prohibition against selling, offering for sale, bartering, or exchanging a game bird or game mammal taken from the wild does not apply to venison from a lawfully-harvested white-tailed deer that is donated to certain local venison donation programs for processing and distribution to certain nonprofit entities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prohibition on Sale of Wildlife - Local Venison Donation Programs - Application
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page