Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $200,000 to $500,000 beginning in fiscal year 2024, the amount of an appropriation that the Governor is required to provide in the annual budget bill for the CASH Campaign of Maryland.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-32)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Appropriations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-32) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text - Chapter - Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page