Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators Gile, Beidle, Ellis, Hershey, Klausmeier, Lewis Young, Mautz, Ready, and A. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice audiology" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the licensure and regulation of audiologists to include certain procedures that do not require anesthesia and certain screenings, testing, and imaging.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-13)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2024
Legislative Date
5/26/2024
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163426/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (121-13) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2024 5/26/2024 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Last Updated: 5/28/2024 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page